skip to content

Guenther, Angela Dorothea

CPSO#: 86297

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:George August Univ of Gottingen, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough
M1E 4B9
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: 416 284 8131 Ext. 4020 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Germany

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANGELA DOROTHEA GUENTHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUENTHER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 04 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PEAP - R - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Pathology

University Of Toronto, 02 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
CF - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2013