skip to content

Gudgeon, Alfred Brian

CPSO#: 22526

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 20 Jan 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 9-Sep-2011

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A.B. Gudgeon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2010

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 17 Jun 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2010