skip to content

Guay, Benoit

CPSO#: 93961

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2013
The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.