skip to content

Gu, Zaodi

CPSO#: 96515

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Oct 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Calgary, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: 705-759-5651
Fax: 705-759-5659 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Zaodi Gu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Gu ( CPSO# 96515 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5651

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:28 Feb 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAODI GU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 08 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 09 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 09 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 18 Oct 2016 to 28 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Oct 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2016