skip to content

Grover, Leonard Fredrick Lawrence

CPSO#: 20754

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 23 Aug 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. D. Kim 2698 Jane St North York ON M3L 1S5 Tel: 416-743-2041
Date Received: 10 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1974 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Aug 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 23, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Leonard Fredrick Lawrence Grover to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 23, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Grover engaged in professional misconduct. During the investigation, Dr. Grover resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)