skip to content

Grove-White, Charles Dermot

CPSO#: 26951

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 16 Dec 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Dublin, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1974
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 16 Dec 1991

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Dec 1991
Summary:

 In December 1991, Dr. Grove-White pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined 
 in s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety 
 with a patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Grove-White guilty of 
 professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Grove-White(s licence to 
 practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Hearing Date(s): Dec 16, 1991

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 1991
Summary:

 In June 1991, Dr. Grove-White pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 27(29) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a 
 patient.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea and found him guilty of professional 
 misconduct.  The Committee further found Dr. Grove-White guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Grove-White(s licence to practice be revoked.

Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 08 Sep 1992
Hearing Date(s): 10 Jun 1991