skip to content

Grossman, Ronald Frank

CPSO#: 26679

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 1974
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1974

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 828-5168
Fax: 905-828-0113 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RONALD FRANK GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1974