skip to content

Grossman, Lawrence

CPSO#: 21663

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 11 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Polyclinic 2 Chanoagne Dr Toronto ON M3J 2C5
Date Received: 12 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Aug 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Apr 2019