skip to content

Groot, Emily Rose

CPSO#: 97893

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Office of the Chief Coroner
Second Floor, Suite 203
199 Larch Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 5P9
Phone: 705-564-6149
Fax: 705-564-6155 Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILY ROSE GROOT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROOT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017