skip to content

Griswold, William Arthur

CPSO#: 28123

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:01 Jan 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1983