skip to content

Grisoli, Dominique Jean Augustin

CPSO#: 87901

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Aix-Marseille II, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 28 Nov 2007 to 03 Jan 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
CF - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008