skip to content

Griller, Nadia Leah

CPSO#: 95061

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
H339-2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 4164806100 Ext. 1978
Fax: 4164804845 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Griller Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Griller ( CPSO# 95061 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Suite HG 52
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:23 Feb 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADIA LEAH GRILLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRILLER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 23 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016