skip to content

Grice, Allison Jean

CPSO#: 92834

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: Saunders, Allison Jean (used until: 07 Jan 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main St E, Grimsby, ON
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone: (905)945-2253 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allison Grice Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grice ( CPSO# 92834 )

Business Address:
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
167 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Mar 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON JEAN GRICE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRICE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2013