skip to content

Greyson, Norman David

CPSO#: 20524

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Nuclear Medical 1104-123 Edward St Toronto ON M5G 0A8
Date Received: 22 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 17 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 23 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019