skip to content

Grewal, Kamal Preet Kaur

CPSO#: 92135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jan 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Rajasthan University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mountainview medical center
Walk-In Clinic
2 Mountainview Rd S
Georgetown ON  L6Z 0E6
Phone: (905) 877-8989
Fax: (905) 877-8181 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kamal Preet Kaur Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Grewal ( CPSO# 92135 )

Business Address:
Mountainview Medical Center
Walk-In Clinic
2 Mountainview Road South
Halton Hills ON  L7G 4J9
Phone Number: (905) 877-8989

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:05 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAMAL PREET KAUR GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2011