Grewal, Aline (CPSO#: 98209)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: Eglence, Aline (used until: 12 Mar 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Grewal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grewal ( CPSO# 98209 )
Dr. A. Grewal ( CPSO# 91616 )

Business Address:
1140 Burnhamthorpe Road West
Suite 138
Mississauga ON  L5C 4E9
Phone Number: (905) 949-9746

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALINE GREWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2014