skip to content

Greisman, Bernard

CPSO#: 25531

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients must contact the clinic at which they were seen
Date Received: 01 Nov 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1973
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 30 Jan 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2017