skip to content

Gregorovich, Sandra Fabiana

CPSO#: 95919

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad de Buenos Aires Facultad de, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sandra Gregorovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Gregorovich ( CPSO# 95919 )

Business Address:
201-20 Emma Street
Building B
Chatham ON  N7L 5K5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:12 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SANDRA FABIANA GREGOROVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREGOROVICH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 14 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 15 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Maternal Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2016