skip to content

Greer-Bayramoglu, Rebecca Jane

CPSO#: 88335

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
19798 Alton, Unit 101
Alton ON  L7K 0E4
Phone: (519) 942-2222
Fax: (519) 341-1579 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Canada
Phone: (519) 941-2410
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.J. Greer-Bayramoglu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Greer-Bayramoglu ( CPSO# 88335 )

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
Suite 101
19798 Main Street
Alton ON  L7K 0E4
Phone Number: (519) 942-2222

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA JANE GREER-BAYRAMOGLU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREER-BAYRAMOGLU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2013