skip to content

Greenwood, Eric David

CPSO#: 89652

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 04 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cincinnati, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Anaesthesia
555 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Peel Memorial
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:21 Jul 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 04 Mar 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 04 Mar 2011 Active
 Dr Eric David Greenwood may practice medicine independently in Anaesthesiology,
            only.