skip to content

Greenway, Matthew John

CPSO#: 87825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone: (905) 685-6555
Fax: (905) 685-6558 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Tabor Manor Long Term Care
1 Tabor Drive
St Catharines ON  L2N 1V9
Canada
Phone: (905) 934-2548
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Tufford Nursing Home
312 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2P 2X4
Canada
Phone: (905) 682-0503
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: O'Reilly & Greenway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. O'Reilly ( CPSO# 87199 )
Dr. M. Greenway ( CPSO# 87825 )

Business Address:
1 Tabor Drive
St Catharines ON  L2N 1V9
Phone Number: (905) 934-2548

Business Address:
Ridley College
2 Ridley Road
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C3
Phone Number: (905) 684-1889

Business Address:
Montebello Medical Centre
8 - 118 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5Y1
Phone Number: (905) 685-6555

Business Address:
78 Yates Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5R9
Phone Number: (905) 685-9155

Business Address:
Pleasant Manor LTC
15 Elden Street
Virgil ON  L0S 1T0
Phone Number: (905) 468-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW JOHN GREENWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 24 Jan 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2009