skip to content

Greenwald, Ilana Rachel

CPSO#: 84768

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
P O Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough Hospitals- General Site
3030 Lawrence Avenue E
Scarborough, Ontario
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 438-2911
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ilana Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Greenwald ( CPSO# 84768 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Emergency
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7111

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
Emergency
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 495-2701

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ILANA RACHEL GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008