skip to content

Greenwald, Allen Gabriel

CPSO#: 95423

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
377 Church Street
Suite G06
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (289) 554-1350
Fax: (905) 205-0100 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

377 Church Street
Suite G07
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7614
Fax: 9054727618
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allen Greenwald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Greenwald ( CPSO# 95423 )

Business Address:
377 Church Street
Suite G06
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (289) 554-1350

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:31 Oct 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLEN GABRIEL GREENWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENWALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015