skip to content

Greene, Treena Ann

CPSO#: 88991

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Manotick Medical Centre
5230 Mitch Owens Road
Ottawa ON  K4M 1B2
Phone: (613) 692-2571
Fax: (613) 692-0271 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TREENA ANN GREENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 06 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
CF - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 2008