skip to content

Greenberg, Joshua Allon

CPSO#: 96089

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
G1-16 O'Brien St
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 259-6300
Fax: (705) 481-0115 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: DR. J.A. GREENBERG MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 12 2021

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenberg ( CPSO# 96089 )

Business Address:
16 O'Brien St
Suite G1
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705)259-6300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Colorectal Surgery Effective:24 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOSHUA ALLON GREENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016