skip to content

Greenaway, John Robert

CPSO#: 20688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Mar 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Cabana Road West
Windsor ON  N9G 1C7
Phone: (519) 566-5664
Fax: (519) 253-8599 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oak Park Terrace
1750 North Service Road
Windsor ON  N8W 1X3
Canada
Phone: (519) 972-3330
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Oak Park LaSalle
3955 13th Street
LaSalle ON  N9H 2S7
Canada
Phone: (519) 968-2000
Fax: (519) 253-8599
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Greenaway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenaway ( CPSO# 20688 )

Business Address:
1750 North Service Road
Windsor ON  N8W 1Y3
Phone Number: (519) 972-3330

Business Address:
3955 13th Street
La Salle ON  N9H 2S7
Phone Number: (519) 968-2000

Business Address:
1881 Cabana Road West
Suite 2309
Windsor ON  N9G 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 566-5664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 09 Mar 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 09 Mar 2020 Active
             As from March 9, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Robert
            Greenaway in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Greenaway
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:


                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. JOHN ROBERT GREENAWAY
                                          ("Dr. Greenaway")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Greenaway, certificate of registration number 20688, am a member
                  of the College.  

            (3)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the
                  College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1109856 (the
                  "Investigation") into my care of patients in a retirement home setting.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to abide by the provisions of this
                  Undertaking, effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for
                        three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision"). 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical
                              Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties, such as direct observation of my
                              practice, reviewing other documents or conducting interviews
                              with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems
                              necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit a written report to the College once at the end of
                              Clinical Supervision, or more frequently if the Clinical
                              Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  (e)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a
                        Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (5)(e)
                        and/or (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time
                        as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that if I am required to cease
                        practise as a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   University of Toronto's Medical Record-Keeping course; and 
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to complete this requirement within
                        three (3) months or, if no satisfactory program is available by
                        that time, at the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake that, approximately three (3) months
                        after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section
                        (5) above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion
                        of the Professional Education set out in section (6) above, I will
                        submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an
                        assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or
                        "Assessors").  I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a
                        chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct
                        observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to co-operate fully with the
                        Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss
                        with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment
                        will be provided to me and reported to the College and the
                        Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenaway, undertake that I will submit to, and not
                        interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations
                        and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenaway, give my irrevocable consent to the College to
                        make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent forms, attached hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of
                  this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that, during the time period that
                        this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be
                        posted on the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following a public complaint, a College investigation was
                              conducted into Dr. Greenaway's care of patients in a
                              retirement home setting. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                                    Dr. Greenaway will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3
                                    months. 
                  
                                    Dr. Greenaway will engage in professional education in
                                    record keeping and care of patients in a retirement
                                    home setting.
                  
                                    Dr. Greenaway's practice will be reassessed by an
                                    assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the
                                    end of the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Greenaway, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in
                        effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Greenaway, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  the following information to any person who requires this information for
                  the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education
                  and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (17)  I, Dr. Greenaway, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide
                  all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Greenaway, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who
                  facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all
                  Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: March 9, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. John Robert Greenaway to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective March 9, 2020:

Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Greenaway’s care of patients in a retirement home setting. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Greenaway will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

Dr. Greenaway will engage in professional education in record keeping and care of patients in a retirement home setting.

Dr. Greenaway’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.