skip to content

Greenaway, John Robert

CPSO#: 20688

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Apr 1967
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1881 Cabana Road West
Windsor ON  N9G 1C7
Phone: (519) 566-5664
Fax: (519) 253-8599 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oak Park Terrace
1750 North Service Road
Windsor ON  N8W 1X3
Canada
Phone: (519) 972-3330
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Oak Park LaSalle
3955 13th Street
LaSalle ON  N9H 2S7
Canada
Phone: (519) 968-2000
Fax: (519) 253-8599
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: John Greenaway Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Greenaway ( CPSO# 20688 )

Business Address:
1750 North Service Road
Windsor ON  N8W 1Y3
Phone Number: (519) 972-3330

Business Address:
3955 13th Street
La Salle ON  N9H 2S7
Phone Number: (519) 968-2000

Business Address:
1881 Cabana Road West
Suite 2309
Windsor ON  N9G 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 566-5664

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1972 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT GREENAWAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREENAWAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1967
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021