skip to content

Green, Robert Nelson

CPSO#: 17260

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 10 Jun 1996
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 05 Sep 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1959
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 May 1996