skip to content

Green, Nicole Michelle

CPSO#: 88804

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Queen Elizabeth Hospital 60 Riverside Drive Charlottetown PE C1A 8T5
Date Received: 26 May 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:10 Oct 2017 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2017