skip to content

Green, Jessica Ashleigh

CPSO#: 95604

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
16 O'Brien Street
Unit 300
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone: (705) 259-6249
Fax: 705-259-6251 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Green Gladwish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 95604 )
Dr. A. Gladwish ( CPSO# 95748 )

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka Regional Cancer Centre
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
Orillia Soldier's Memorial Hospital
170 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3B 2Z3
Phone Number: (705) 327-9123

Business Address:
300 - 16 O'Briend Street
Orillia ON  L3V 5S2
Phone Number: (705) 259-6249

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrew's Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JESSICA ASHLEIGH GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2016