skip to content

Green, Jason Paul

CPSO#: 90405

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 749-6578 Ext. 6410
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jay Green Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Green ( CPSO# 90405 )

Business Address:
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 749-6578

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JASON PAUL GREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 04 May 2009 to 31 May 2009
EL - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012