skip to content

Greaves, Francis Wood

CPSO#: 31954

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jul 2021
EXPIRY DATE
02 Jul 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Francis Greaves, Medicine, Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2021
Corporation Name: Dr.'s Thomson, Howlett, Hawkes, Rosta, Saab, Baldauf, Greaves & McIver Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. McIver ( CPSO# 31778 )
Dr. F. Greaves ( CPSO# 31954 )
Dr. S. Thomson ( CPSO# 57552 )
Dr. N. Rosta ( CPSO# 67897 )
Dr. L. Howlett ( CPSO# 68288 )
Dr. C. Baldauf ( CPSO# 72518 )
Dr. R. Hawkes ( CPSO# 77933 )
Dr. G. Saab ( CPSO# 81104 )
Dr. S. Drover ( CPSO# 82776 )

Business Address:
Owen Sound Medical Centre
Suite 3600
1415 1st Avenue West
Owen Sound ON  N4K 4K8
Phone Number: (519) 376-2000

Business Address:
Grey Bruce Health Services
1800 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 376-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jul 2021