skip to content

Graystone, Amber

CPSO#: 94103

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (888) 900-2760
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

260 Sugarloaf St
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7
Canada
Phone: 9053784647
Fax: 8889002760
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-343
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-343
Fax: (888) 900-2760
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 5 2018
Corporation Name: Amber Graystone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graystone ( CPSO# 94103 )

Business Address:
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 6P9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
230 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z2
Phone Number: (905) 329-2721

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8

Business Address:
260 Sugarloaf Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 2N7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 21 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMBER GRAYSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAYSTONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 2013