skip to content

Gray, Christopher John George

CPSO#: 87955

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2009
EXPIRY DATE
31 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Jan 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 02 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Adult Cardiac Electrophysiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009