skip to content

Gray, Catherine Jean

CPSO#: 87613

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1y 4E9
Phone: 613 798-5555 Ext. 16574
Fax: (613) 761-4665 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Gray ( CPSO# 87613 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
Room 408
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-5164

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Medical Associates
2211 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X5
Phone Number: (613) 733-2344


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CATHERINE JEAN GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 22 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
EL - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2009