skip to content

Gray, Andrew Joseph Fleetwood

CPSO#: 98065

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock General Hospital
Emergency Department
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Gray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gray ( CPSO# 98065 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW JOSEPH FLEETWOOD GRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014