skip to content

Gravelle, Sean Kelly

CPSO#: 98283

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: 705-759-3434 Ext. Ext. 3691
Fax: 705-759-3704 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sean Gravelle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:02 Aug 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SEAN KELLY GRAVELLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAVELLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 29 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 28 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2015 to 02 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016