skip to content

Grapko-Mysak, Deborah Anne

CPSO#: 32152

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 1981

Summary

Former Names: Grapko, Deborah Anne (used until: 15 Feb 2004 )     Grapko-Buba, Deborah Anne (used until: 22 May 2000 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Deborah Anne Grapko-Mysak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Grapko-Mysak ( CPSO# 32152 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEBORAH ANNE GRAPKO-MYSAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRAPKO-MYSAK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 1981