skip to content

Grant, Merle Elaine

CPSO#: 32670

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 15-Jul-2017

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 1356 1500 Avenue Road Toronto ON M5M 0A1
Date Received: 27 Apr 2015


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Dr. Merle Grant 1500 Avenue Road P.O BOX 135 Toronto, ON M5M 0A1
Date Received: 03 Jan 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017