skip to content

Grant, Mary Margaret

CPSO#: 87258

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
123 Edward Street
Suite 600
Toronto ON  M5R 1E2
Phone: (416) 597 1016 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mary Margaret Grant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Grant ( CPSO# 87258 )

Business Address:
600 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5R 1E2
Phone Number: (416) 597-1016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY MARGARET GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2013