skip to content

Grant, Frederick Curry

CPSO#: 27217

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Mar 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Mar 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stroke Prevention Clinic Sills 2
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2871
Fax: (613) 961-2544 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 28 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FREDERICK CURRY GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 1975