skip to content

Grant, Brian

CPSO#: 85056

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Aug 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008