skip to content

Grant, Allison Lee-Anne

CPSO#: 88698

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Medical Imaging
585 University Ave
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 416-323-6400 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Breast Imaging
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Princess Margaret Hospital
Dept of Breast Imaging
610 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury, ON
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: 705-675-2283
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Allison Grant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88698 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1B2

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
12 Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:16 Aug 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALLISON LEE-ANNE GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 17 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2014