skip to content

Grant, Aaron Leigh

CPSO#: 88646

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
L H S C University Hospital
Department of Plastic Surgery
Room B8 030
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3321
Fax: 519-663-3289 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aaron L. Grant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 88646 )

Business Address:
LHSC-University Hospital
Department of Plastic Surgery
Room B8-030
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3321

Business Address:
746 Baseline Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z2

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AARON LEIGH GRANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2014