skip to content

Grainger, Ronald Wayne

CPSO#: 19026

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1967 RCPSC Specialist
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1962
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013