skip to content

Graham, Ian Davidson

CPSO#: 22645

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:07 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 28 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 29 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 16 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 19 Aug 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Aug 2020

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 16 Apr 2009
Summary:

On April 16, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Graham committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
1.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to impose immediately the following 
      terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Graham s Certificate of Registration: 
 
      (a)   Dr. Graham shall not prescribe narcotics or controlled drugs and substances as 
            defined in Schedules I to IV of the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, 
            including but not limited to all narcotic drugs, narcotic preparations, controlled 
            drugs, benzodiazepines and other targeted substances;  
 
      (b)   Dr. Graham shall not accept for treatment any patients with bipolar disorders. If 
            any patients commence treatment and are subsequently identified as suffering 
            from a bipolar disorder he shall attempt to transfer their care to another physician 
            and will cease treating the patient within 30 days;    
 
      (c)   At his own expense, Dr. Graham shall undergo a comprehensive practice 
            assessment (the CPA ), to be completed within eight months of the date of this 
            order, by an assessor qualified to assess his practice selected by the College, and 
            shall abide by any and all recommendations made as result of  the CPA. This 
            CPA will be conducted at Dr. Graham s sole expense; 
 
      (d)   Dr. Graham shall practice only under the supervision of a clinical supervisor 
            approved by the College who has signed an undertaking and who has reviewed the 
            College s expert report dated December 24, 2007. This clinical supervisor will be 
            at Dr. Graham s expense and will report regularly to the College or immediately if 
            the clinical supervisor has concerns regarding patient safety or regarding Dr. 
            Graham s compliance with the terms of this order. The supervision will continue 
            until Dr. Graham receives notice from the College that the report of the CPA has 
            been received and considered by the College; and 
 
      (e)   Dr. Graham shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of 
            his practice(s) and patient charts by College representatives, and other College 
            activities conducted for the purposes of assessing his compliance with these terms, 
            conditions and limitations on his certificate of registration. All such inspections 
            shall be at Dr. Graham s sole expense. 
 
2.    The Discipline Committee Orders Dr. Graham to pay to the College costs in the amount 
      of $3,650.00, within 30 days of the date of this Order. 
 
3.    The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the 
      register. 
 
  
 
               
              
              


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): April 16, 2009

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: August 19, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ian Davidson Graham to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 19, 2020:

A College investigation was initiated into whether Dr. Graham engaged in professional misconduct in his psychotherapy practice, including whether he failed to maintain appropriate boundaries with a patient. During the investigation, Dr. Graham resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

 

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: January 17, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)