skip to content

Graff Guerrero, Ariel

CPSO#: 90401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 03 Dec 2009
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Michoacan Univ of San Nicolas de Hidalgo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
GPD and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 34834 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Graff Guerrero Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Graff Guerrero ( CPSO# 90401 )

Business Address:
CAMH
GMHP and RIC
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Dec 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 May 2009 to 12 Jul 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 13 Jul 2009 to 30 Nov 2009
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Aug 2013

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Aug 2013 Active
             1.    Dr. Ariel Graff Guerrero may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry, University of Toronto, in which Dr.Graff Guerrero holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically  expires  when Dr.Graff
                  Guerrero no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.