skip to content

Grady, Rosheen Mary

CPSO#: 98373

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Sep 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Adolescent Medicine
Health Sciences Centre, 3A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton, Ontario L8S 4K1
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. ext 73373
Fax: 905-308-7548 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rosheen Grady Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Grady ( CPSO# 98373 )

Business Address:
1280 Main Street West
Suite 3A
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 545-5303

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROSHEEN MARY GRADY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRADY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016