skip to content

Gracey, Janel Louise

CPSO#: 89802

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Apr 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Queens Ave
London ON  N6A 1J3
Phone: 5196733242
Fax: 5196731022 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

648 Huron st.
second floor
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Canada
Phone: 5194349191
Fax: 5194381167
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

475 Talbot St.
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Canada
Phone: (519) 631-9040
Fax: (519) 631-9355
County: County of Elgin
Electoral District: 02

58 Front St. E.
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 205 0637
Fax: (519) 205 0639
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: J. L. Gracey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Gracey ( CPSO# 89802 )

Business Address:
203-215 Fanshawe Park Road West
London ON  N6G 5A9
Phone Number: (519) 434-4727

Business Address:
58 Front Street East
Strathroy ON  N7G 1Y6
Phone Number: (519) 205-0637

Business Address:
475 Talbot Street
St Thomas ON  N5P 1C1
Phone Number: (519) 631-9040

Business Address:
648 Huron Street
2nd Floor
London ON  N5Y 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 424-9191

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:12 Jan 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANEL LOUISE GRACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRACEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2009