skip to content

Grace, David Michael

CPSO#: 19614

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Sep 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Western University, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medpoint Healthcare Centre 233 - 355 Wellington St London, ON N6A 3N7 Tel: (519) 432-1919
Instructions: Medical records location as per above.
Date Received: 24 Apr 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1965
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 12 Aug 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018